Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 05/27/2010
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 05/27/2010
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 05/27/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 05/27/2010
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA]* 05/27/2010
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 05/27/2010
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 05/27/2010
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 05/27/2010
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 05/27/2010
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 05/27/2010
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 05/27/2010
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 05/27/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 05/27/2010
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 05/27/2010
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 05/27/2010
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/07/2010
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/07/2010
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 06/08/2010
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/10/2010
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 06/21/2010
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/29/2010
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/12/2010
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 07/12/2010
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 07/12/2010
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/14/2010
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 07/21/2010
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 07/22/2010
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/26/2010
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/26/2010
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/26/2010
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/29/2010
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 08/02/2010
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/28/2010