Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 06/10/2010
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/16/2010
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 07/29/2010
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 07/29/2010
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 08/03/2010
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 09/13/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 09/13/2010
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 09/13/2010
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/13/2010
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 09/13/2010
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 09/13/2010
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/15/2010
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 09/15/2010
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 09/15/2010
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 09/23/2010
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/23/2010
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 09/23/2010
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/28/2010
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/28/2010
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/28/2010
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 09/29/2010
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 09/29/2010
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/29/2010
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 09/29/2010
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/29/2010
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 09/29/2010
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 09/29/2010
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 11/15/2010
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 11/15/2010
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 11/15/2010
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 11/15/2010
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 11/15/2010
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 11/18/2010
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 12/09/2010
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 12/09/2010