Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/15/2010
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/16/2010
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 06/17/2010
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 06/17/2010
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/23/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/23/2010
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/28/2010
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 07/27/2010
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 08/03/2010
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/13/2010
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 09/23/2010