Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 01/29/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 02/09/2009
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 05/05/2009
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/05/2009
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 06/02/2009
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 06/25/2009
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/07/2009
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 07/10/2009
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 07/16/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 09/15/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 03/08/2010