Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 06/15/2010
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 06/15/2010
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA]* 06/15/2010
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 06/15/2010
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 06/15/2010
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 06/15/2010
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/16/2010
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/29/2010
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 08/03/2010
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 09/14/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 12/06/2010