Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 06/15/2010
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 06/15/2010
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/12/2010
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/13/2010
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 07/20/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 08/04/2010
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 08/05/2010