Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 07/21/2010
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 07/21/2010
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/21/2010
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 07/21/2010
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 07/21/2010
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/28/2010
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 07/28/2010
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 07/28/2010
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 07/28/2010
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 07/28/2010
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/28/2010
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 08/04/2010
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 08/04/2010
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 08/05/2010
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/28/2010