Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 06/17/2010
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 06/17/2010
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 06/17/2010
Sen. LeMieux, George S. [R-FL]* 06/17/2010
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/23/2010
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 07/12/2010
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/13/2010
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/15/2010
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 07/26/2010
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 08/03/2010
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 08/03/2010
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 08/04/2010
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 08/04/2010
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 08/05/2010
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/21/2010