Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. LeMieux, George S. [R-FL]* 06/18/2010
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 06/18/2010
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 06/22/2010
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 06/22/2010
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 06/23/2010
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 06/24/2010
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 06/28/2010