Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 06/21/2010
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 06/22/2010
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/23/2010
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 07/15/2010
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/22/2010