Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 06/22/2010
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 06/22/2010
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/28/2010
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/13/2010
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 07/13/2010
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/15/2010
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 08/12/2010