Text: S.3520 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/22/2010)


111th CONGRESS
2d Session
S. 3520


To provide for an extension of unemployment insurance.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

June 22, 2010

Ms. Stabenow (for herself, Mr. Merkley, Mr. Franken, Mr. Brown of Ohio, and Mr. Whitehouse) introduced the following bill; which was read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance


A BILL

To provide for an extension of unemployment insurance.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Unemployment Insurance Extension Act of 2010”.

SEC. 2. Extension of unemployment insurance provisions.

(a) In general.—(1) Section 4007 of the Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2008 (Public Law 110–252; 26 U.S.C. 3304 note) is amended—

(A) by striking “June 2, 2010” each place it appears and inserting “December 31, 2010”;

(B) in the heading for subsection (b)(2), by striking “june 2, 2010” and inserting “december 31, 2010”; and

(C) in subsection (b)(3), by striking “November 6, 2010” and inserting “May 31, 2011”.

(2) Section 2002(e) of the Assistance for Unemployed Workers and Struggling Families Act, as contained in Public Law 111–5 (26 U.S.C. 3304 note; 123 Stat. 438), is amended—

(A) in paragraph (1)(B), by striking “June 2, 2010” and inserting “December 31, 2010”;

(B) in the heading for paragraph (2), by striking “june 2, 2010” and inserting “december 31, 2010”; and

(C) in paragraph (3), by striking “December 7, 2010” and inserting “June 30, 2011”.

(3) Section 2005 of the Assistance for Unemployed Workers and Struggling Families Act, as contained in Public Law 111–5 (26 U.S.C. 3304 note; 123 Stat. 444), is amended—

(A) by striking “June 2, 2010” each place it appears and inserting “January 1, 2011”; and

(B) in subsection (c), by striking “November 6, 2010” and inserting “June 1, 2011”.

(4) Section 5 of the Unemployment Compensation Extension Act of 2008 (Public Law 110–449; 26 U.S.C. 3304 note) is amended by striking “November 6, 2010” and inserting “May 31, 2011”.

(b) Funding.—Section 4004(e)(1) of the Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2008 (Public Law 110–252; 26 U.S.C. 3304 note) is amended—

(1) in subparagraph (D), by striking “and” at the end; and

(2) by inserting after subparagraph (E) the following:

“(F) the amendments made by section 2(a)(1) of the Unemployment Insurance Extension Act of 2010; and”.

(c) Effective date.—The amendments made by this section shall take effect as if included in the enactment of the Continuing Extension Act of 2010 (Public Law 111–157).

SEC. 3. Budgetary provisions.

(a) Statutory PAYGO.—The budgetary effects of this Act, for the purpose of complying with the Statutory Pay-As-You-Go Act of 2010, shall be determined by reference to the latest statement titled “Budgetary Effects of PAYGO Legislation” for this Act, submitted for printing in the Congressional Record by the Chairman of the Senate Budget Committee, provided that such statement has been submitted prior to the vote on passage.

(b) Emergency designations.—Section 2—

(1) is designated as an emergency requirement pursuant to section 4(g) of the Statutory Pay-As-You-Go Act of 2010 (Public Law 111–139; 2 U.S.C. 933(g));

(2) in the House of Representatives, is designated as an emergency for purposes of pay-as-you-go principles; and

(3) in the Senate, is designated as an emergency requirement pursuant to section 403(a) of S. Con. Res. 13 (111th Congress), the concurrent resolution on the budget for fiscal year 2010.