There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

United States Marshals Service 225th Anniversary Commemorative Coin Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require the Secretary of the Treasury to mint coins in commemoration of the 225th anniversary of the establishment of the Nation's first law enforcement agency, the United States Marshals Service.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/13/2010Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
07/13/2010Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (67)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 07/13/2010
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 07/15/2010
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/15/2010
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 07/15/2010
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/15/2010
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 07/21/2010
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/21/2010
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/21/2010
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 07/26/2010
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 08/03/2010
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 08/04/2010
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 08/04/2010
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 08/05/2010
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 08/05/2010
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 08/05/2010
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 08/05/2010
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 08/05/2010
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 08/05/2010
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 08/05/2010
Sen. Goodwin, Carte Patrick [D-WV] 08/05/2010
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 08/05/2010
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 08/05/2010
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 08/05/2010
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 08/05/2010
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 08/05/2010
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 08/05/2010
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 08/05/2010
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 08/05/2010
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 08/05/2010
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 08/05/2010
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 08/05/2010
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 08/05/2010
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 08/05/2010
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 08/05/2010
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 08/05/2010
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 08/05/2010
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 08/05/2010
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 08/05/2010
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 08/05/2010
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 08/05/2010
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 08/05/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 09/13/2010
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 09/13/2010
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 09/13/2010
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 09/21/2010
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/21/2010
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/27/2010
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 09/29/2010
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 09/29/2010
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 09/29/2010
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 09/29/2010
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 09/29/2010
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 09/29/2010
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 09/29/2010
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 11/15/2010
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 11/15/2010
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 11/15/2010
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 11/15/2010
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 11/15/2010
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 11/15/2010
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 11/30/2010
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 11/30/2010
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 11/30/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 12/06/2010
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 12/08/2010
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 12/08/2010
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 12/08/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs07/13/2010 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.3572. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (07/13/2010)

United States Marshals Service 225th Anniversary Commemorative Coin Act - Directs the Secretary of the Treasury, in commemoration of the 225th anniversary of the establishment of the United States Marshals Service, to mint and issue $5 gold and $1 silver coins emblematic of the 225 years of exemplary and unparalleled achievements of the U.S. Marshals Service.

Requires all such coin sales to include a surcharge of: (1) $35 per $5 coin; and (2) $10 per $1 coin. Requires distribution of the first $5 million to the Director of the United States Marshals Service National Museum, for the preservation, maintenance, and display of artifacts and documents of the U.S. Marshals Service. Requires distribution of: (1) $1 million to the National Center for Missing and Exploited Children; (2) $1 million to the National Law Enforcement Officers Memorial Fund in support of the National Law Enforcement Museum and the National Law Enforcement Officers Memorial; (3) $1 million to the Federal Law Enforcement Officers Association; (4) $500,000 to the William "Bill" Degan Scholarship Fund (provides scholarships for spouses and children of law enforcement officers killed in the line of duty); (5) $500,000 to the Robert D. May Scholarship Fund (provides scholarships for spouses and children of law enforcement officers killed in the line of duty); (6) $500,000 to the Community Oriented Policing Service; and (7) $500,000 to the Retired United States Marshals Service Association.

Authorizes the Secretary to strike and sell bronze duplicates of the $5 gold coins.