Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 07/13/2010
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 07/15/2010
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/15/2010
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 07/15/2010
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/15/2010
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 07/21/2010
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/21/2010
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/21/2010
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 07/26/2010
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 08/03/2010
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 08/04/2010
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 08/04/2010
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 08/05/2010
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 08/05/2010
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 08/05/2010
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 08/05/2010
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 08/05/2010
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 08/05/2010
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 08/05/2010
Sen. Goodwin, Carte Patrick [D-WV] 08/05/2010
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 08/05/2010
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 08/05/2010
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 08/05/2010
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 08/05/2010
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 08/05/2010
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 08/05/2010
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 08/05/2010
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 08/05/2010
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 08/05/2010
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 08/05/2010
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 08/05/2010
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 08/05/2010
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 08/05/2010
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 08/05/2010
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 08/05/2010
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 08/05/2010
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 08/05/2010
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 08/05/2010
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 08/05/2010
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 08/05/2010
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 08/05/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 09/13/2010
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 09/13/2010
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 09/13/2010
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 09/21/2010
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/21/2010
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/27/2010
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 09/29/2010
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 09/29/2010
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 09/29/2010
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 09/29/2010
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 09/29/2010
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 09/29/2010
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 09/29/2010
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 11/15/2010
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 11/15/2010
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 11/15/2010
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 11/15/2010
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 11/15/2010
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 11/15/2010
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 11/30/2010
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 11/30/2010
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 11/30/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 12/06/2010
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 12/08/2010
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 12/08/2010
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 12/08/2010