Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 07/14/2010
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 07/14/2010
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 07/14/2010
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 07/21/2010
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/28/2010
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/29/2010
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 08/04/2010