Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 07/21/2010
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 07/21/2010
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 07/21/2010
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 07/21/2010
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 07/21/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 07/21/2010
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 07/21/2010
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 07/21/2010
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 07/21/2010
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 07/21/2010
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 07/21/2010
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/22/2010
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/27/2010
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 08/04/2010
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/13/2010
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/13/2010