Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 07/21/2010
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/22/2010
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 07/26/2010
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 07/27/2010
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 08/03/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 08/04/2010
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 08/04/2010
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/20/2010