There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Mandatory Price Reporting Act of 2010

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Mandatory Price Reporting Act of 2010

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Mandatory Price Reporting Act of 2010

Short Titles as Introduced

Mandatory Price Reporting Act of 2010

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Agricultural Marketing Act of 1946 to improve the reporting on sales of livestock and dairy products, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
09/27/2010Became Public Law No: 111-239. (TXT | PDF)
09/27/2010Signed by President.
09/21/2010Presented to President.
09/15/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6706-6707)
08/05/2010Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6977-6978; text as passed Senate: CR S6977-6978)
08/05/2010Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. Reported by Senator Lincoln without amendment. Without written report.
07/27/2010Introduced in Senate

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/27/2010Became Public Law No: 111-239. (TXT | PDF)
09/27/2010Signed by President.
09/21/2010SenatePresented to President.
09/15/2010-12:26pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/15/2010-12:26pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6706-6707)
09/15/2010-12:21pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3656.
09/15/2010-12:21pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6706-6707)
09/15/2010-12:21pmHouseMr. Scott (GA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
08/09/2010HouseReferred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
08/09/2010-7:07pmHouseReceived in the House.
08/06/2010SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/05/2010SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6977-6978; text as passed Senate: CR S6977-6978)
08/05/2010SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
08/05/2010SenateCommittee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. Reported by Senator Lincoln without amendment. Without written report.
08/04/2010SenateCommittee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
07/27/2010SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
07/27/2010SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S6305-6306)

Cosponsors (19)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry07/27/2010 Referred to
08/04/2010 Markup by
08/05/2010 Reported by
House Agriculture08/09/2010 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.3656. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-239 (09/27/2010)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Mandatory Price Reporting Act of 2010 - Amends the Agricultural Marketing Act of 1946 to: (1) extend reporting requirements for livestock daily markets through September 30, 2015; (2) establish mandatory reporting for wholesale pork cuts; and (3) direct the Secretary of Agriculture (USDA) to establish, and implement within one year, an electronic price reporting system for dairy products.