Text: S.3656 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-239 (09/27/2010)




[111th Congress Public Law 239]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]



[[Page 124 STAT. 2501]]

Public Law 111-239
111th Congress

                                 An Act


 
To amend the Agricultural Marketing Act of 1946 to improve the reporting 
        on sales of livestock and dairy products, and for other 
            purposes. <<NOTE: Sept. 27, 2010 -  [S. 3656]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled, <<NOTE: Mandatory Price 
Reporting Act of 2010.>> 
SECTION 1. <<NOTE: 7 USC 1621 note.>> SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``Mandatory Price Reporting Act of 
2010''.
SEC. 2. LIVESTOCK MANDATORY REPORTING.

    (a) Extension of Authority.--
            (1) In general.--Section 260 of the Agricultural Marketing 
        Act of 1946 (7 U.S.C. 1636i) is amended by striking ``September 
        30, 2010'' and inserting ``September 30, 2015''.
            (2) Conforming amendment and extension.--Section 942 of the 
        Livestock Mandatory Reporting Act of 1999 (7 U.S.C. 1635 note; 
        Public Law 106-78) is amended by striking ``September 30, 2010'' 
        and inserting ``September 30, 2015''.

    (b) Wholesale Pork Cuts.--
            (1) Reporting.--Chapter 3 of subtitle B of the Agricultural 
        Marketing Act of 1946 (7 U.S.C. 1635i et seq.) is amended by 
        adding at the end the following new section:
``SEC. 233. <<NOTE: 7 USC 1635k.>> MANDATORY REPORTING OF 
                        WHOLESALE PORK CUTS.

    ``(a) Reporting.--The corporate officers or officially designated 
representatives of each packer shall report to the Secretary information 
concerning the price and volume of wholesale pork cuts, as the Secretary 
determines is necessary and appropriate.
    ``(b) Publication.--The Secretary shall publish information reported 
under subsection (a) as the Secretary determines necessary and 
appropriate.''.
            (2) Negotiated <<NOTE: 7 USC 1635k note.>> rulemaking.--The 
        Secretary of Agriculture shall establish a negotiated rulemaking 
        process pursuant to subchapter III of chapter 5 of title 5, 
        United States Code, to negotiate and develop a proposed rule to 
        implement the amendment made by paragraph (1).
            (3) Negotiated rulemaking committee.--
                    (A) Representation.--Any negotiated rulemaking 
                committee established by the Secretary of Agriculture 
                pursuant to paragraph (2) shall include representatives 
                from--
                          (i) organizations representing swine 
                      producers;

[[Page 124 STAT. 2502]]

                          (ii) organizations representing packers of 
                      pork, processors of pork, retailers of pork, and 
                      buyers of wholesale pork;
                          (iii) the Department of Agriculture; and
                          (iv) among interested parties that participate 
                      in swine or pork production.
                    (B) Inapplicability of federal advisory committee 
                act.--Any negotiated rulemaking committee established by 
                the Secretary of Agriculture pursuant to paragraph (2) 
                shall not be subject to the Federal Advisory Committee 
                Act (5 U.S.C. App.).
            (4) Timing of proposed and final rules.--In carrying out the 
        negotiated rulemaking process under paragraph (2), the Secretary 
        of Agriculture shall ensure that--
                    (A) any <<NOTE: Recommenda- tions.>>  recommendation 
                for a proposed rule or report is provided to the 
                Secretary of Agriculture not later than 180 days after 
                the date of the enactment of this Act; and
                    (B) a final rule is promulgated not later than one 
                and a half years after the date of the enactment of this 
                Act.

    (c) Pork Export Reporting.--Section 602(a)(1) of the Agricultural 
Trade Act of 1978 (7 U.S.C. 5712(a)(1)) is amended by striking 
``cotton,'' and inserting ``cotton, pork,''.
SEC. 3. DAIRY MANDATORY REPORTING.

    (a) Electronic Reporting Required.--Subsection (d) of section 273 of 
the Agricultural Marketing Act of 1946 (7 U.S.C. 1637b) is amended to 
read as follows:
    ``(d) Electronic Reporting.--
            ``(1) Electronic reporting system required.--The Secretary 
        shall establish an electronic reporting system to carry out this 
        section.
            ``(2) Publication.--Not later than 3:00 p.m. Eastern Time on 
        the Wednesday of each week, the Secretary shall publish a report 
        containing the information obtained under this section for the 
        preceding week.''.

    (b) Implementation.--Not <<NOTE: 7 USC 1637b note.>>  later than one 
year after the date of enactment of this Act, the Secretary of 
Agriculture shall implement the electronic reporting system required by 
subsection (d) of section 273 of the Agricultural Marketing Act of 1946 
(7 U.S.C. 1637b), as amended by subsection (a). Until the electronic 
reporting system is implemented, the Secretary shall continue to conduct 
mandatory dairy product information reporting under the authority

[[Page 124 STAT. 2503]]

of such section, as in effect on the day before the date of enactment of 
this Act.

    Approved September 27, 2010.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--S. 3656:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 156 (2010):
            Aug. 5, considered and passed Senate.
            Sept. 15, considered and passed House.

                                  <all>