Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 07/27/2010
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 07/27/2010
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 08/05/2010
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/14/2010
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 09/15/2010
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/20/2010