Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 02/03/2009
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 02/03/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 02/03/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 02/03/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/12/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/01/2009
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 06/23/2009
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 09/09/2009
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 02/24/2010
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/26/2010
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 08/02/2010