Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC]* 02/03/2009
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 02/03/2009
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 02/03/2009
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 02/03/2009
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 05/18/2009
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 05/19/2009
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/22/2009
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/22/2009
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 06/22/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 06/22/2009
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 07/29/2009
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 07/29/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 07/29/2009
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 07/29/2009
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 07/29/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/29/2009
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 07/29/2009
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 07/29/2009
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 07/29/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 07/29/2009
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 07/29/2009