Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 08/04/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 09/15/2010
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 09/15/2010
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 09/23/2010
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/27/2010
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 11/15/2010
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 11/18/2010