Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 08/05/2010
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 08/05/2010
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 08/05/2010
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 08/05/2010
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 08/05/2010
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 08/05/2010
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 09/16/2010
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/27/2010
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 09/28/2010
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/29/2010
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 11/17/2010
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 11/18/2010