Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 08/05/2010
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 09/20/2010
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 09/21/2010
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/21/2010
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 09/21/2010
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 09/21/2010
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/21/2010
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 09/21/2010
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/21/2010
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 09/27/2010
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 11/17/2010