Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 08/05/2010
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 08/05/2010
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 08/05/2010
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/15/2010
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 09/29/2010
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 11/30/2010
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 12/08/2010
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 12/14/2010