Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 08/05/2010
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL]* 08/05/2010
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 08/05/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 08/05/2010
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 08/05/2010
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 08/05/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 08/05/2010
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 08/05/2010
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 08/05/2010
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 08/05/2010
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 09/15/2010
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/15/2010
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 11/17/2010
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 11/17/2010
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 11/19/2010
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 12/09/2010
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 12/14/2010