Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC]* 08/05/2010
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/14/2010
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 09/14/2010
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/20/2010
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 09/21/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 09/29/2010
Sen. Goodwin, Carte Patrick [D-WV] 09/29/2010