There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Stem Cell Therapeutic and Research Reauthorization Act of 2010

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Stem Cell Therapeutic and Research Reauthorization Act of 2010

Short Titles as Introduced

Stem Cell Therapeutic and Research Reauthorization Act of 2010

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Stem Cell Therapeutic and Research Act of 2005.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
10/08/2010Became Public Law No: 111-264. (TXT | PDF)
10/08/2010Signed by President.
10/04/2010Presented to President.
09/30/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR 9/28/2010 H7186-7188)
09/28/2010Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7650-7653; text as passed Senate: CR S7650-7651)
09/23/2010Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Harkin with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
08/05/2010Introduced in Senate

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/08/2010Became Public Law No: 111-264. (TXT | PDF)
10/08/2010Signed by President.
10/04/2010SenatePresented to President.
09/30/2010-12:42amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/30/2010-12:42amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 9/28/2010 H7186-7188)
09/30/2010-12:42amHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7380)
09/28/2010-10:15pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Burgess objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
09/28/2010-10:06pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3751.
09/28/2010-10:06pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7186-7189)
09/28/2010-10:06pmHouseMr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/28/2010SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/28/2010-2:46pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/28/2010SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7650-7653; text as passed Senate: CR S7650-7651)
09/23/2010SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 587.
09/23/2010SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Harkin with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
09/23/2010SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
08/05/2010SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6901)
08/05/2010SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S6900-6901)

Cosponsors (12)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions08/05/2010 Referred to
09/23/2010 Markup by
09/23/2010 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.3751. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-264 (10/08/2010)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the Senate on September 23, 2010. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Stem Cell Therapeutic and Research Reauthorization Act of 2010 - (Sec. 2) Amends the Stem Cell Therapeutic and Research Act of 2005 to revise provisions related to the National Cord Blood Inventory (the Inventory), including to establish an inventory goal of at least 150,000 new units of cord blood to be made available under the C.W. Bill Young Cell Transplantation Program (the Program). (Currently, the number of units of cord blood is capped at 150,000).

Revises application requirements for cord blood banks participating in the Inventory to require such banks to: (1) make assurances that cord blood units will be available for direct transplantation until the cord blood unit is released for transplantation for a first degree relative; (2) participate in the Program for a period of at least ten years beginning on the last date on which the recipient receives federal funds under a contract; (3) provide a plan to increase cord blood unit collections at collection sites that exist at the time of application, assist with the establishment of new collection sites, or contract with new collection sites; and (4) annually provide to the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) a plan for, and demonstrate, ongoing measurable progress toward achieving self-sufficiency of cord blood unit collection and banking operations.

Revises the requirements for a contract extension to make a qualified cord blood bank eligible for a five-year extension if the bank demonstrates a superior ability to satisfy the requirements of the contract and achieve the overall goals for which the contract was awarded.

Redefines the term "first-degree relative" to exclude a parent.

Authorizes appropriations for FY2011-FY2015 for the Inventory.

Amends the Public Health Service Act to require the Program to support and expand studies and demonstration and outreach projects that focus on: (1) remote collection of cord blood units; and (2) novel approaches or incentives to encourage innovative technological advances that could be used to collect cord blood units. Defines "remote collection" to mean the collection of cord blood units at locations that do not have written contracts with cord blood banks for collection support.

Requires the Secretary to: (1) set an annual goal of increasing collections of high quality cord blood units; (2) identify at least one demonstration or outreach project to replicate and expand nationwide, as appropriate; and (3) submit a plan for meeting such goal to the relevant congressional committees if no such project can be identified.

Revises privacy requirements to protect the identity and privacy of patients and donors in accordance with federal and state law.

Requires the Secretary to submit an interim report to Congress within 180 days of enactment of this Act describing: (1) the methods to distribute federal funds to cord blood banks; (2) how cord blood banks contract with collection sites for the collection of cord blood units; and (3) recommendations for improving the methods to distribute federal funds to encourage the efficient collection of high-quality and diverse cord blood units. Directs the Advisory Council on Blood Stem Cell Transplantation to submit recommendations to the Secretary with respect to remote collection of cord blood units.

Authorizes appropriations for FY2011-FY2015 to carry out the Program.

Directs the Comptroller General to submit to the relevant congressional committees and the Secretary a report reviewing studies, demonstration programs, and outreach efforts for the purpose of increasing cord blood unit donation and collection for the Inventory to ensure a high-quality and genetically diverse inventory of cord blood units.