Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 08/05/2010
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 08/05/2010
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 08/05/2010
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 08/05/2010
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 08/05/2010
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 09/13/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 09/13/2010
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 09/23/2010
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 09/27/2010
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/27/2010
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 09/27/2010
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 09/28/2010