Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/28/2010
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 09/29/2010
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 09/29/2010
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 09/29/2010
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/29/2010
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 11/15/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 12/02/2010
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 12/14/2010