Refine your search

Showing 7 of 7 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
11/24/2010 Became Public Law No: 111-285.
11/24/2010 Signed by President.
11/19/2010 Presented to President.
11/18/2010 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 366 - 40 (Roll no. 580).(text: CR 11/17/2010 H7521)
09/29/2010 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S7763)
09/29/2010 Senate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent.
09/14/2010 Introduced in Senate