Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 09/15/2010
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 09/15/2010
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 09/15/2010
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 09/15/2010
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 09/15/2010
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 09/15/2010
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 09/15/2010
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 09/15/2010
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 09/16/2010
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/16/2010
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/21/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 09/22/2010
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 09/22/2010
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 09/23/2010
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/27/2010
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 09/28/2010
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 09/28/2010
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 09/28/2010
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/29/2010