There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Social Security Number Protection Act of 2010

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Social Security Number Protection Act of 2010

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Social Security Number Protection Act of 2010

Short Titles as Introduced

Social Security Number Protection Act of 2010

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to limit access to social security account numbers.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
12/18/2010Became Public Law No: 111-318. (TXT | PDF)
12/18/2010Signed by President.
12/09/2010Presented to President.
12/08/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8100)
09/28/2010Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S7655)
09/28/2010Senate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7655)
09/15/2010Introduced in Senate

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/18/2010Became Public Law No: 111-318. (TXT | PDF)
12/18/2010Signed by President.
12/09/2010SenatePresented to President.
12/08/2010-11:04amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/08/2010-11:04amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8100)
12/08/2010-10:53amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3789.
12/08/2010-10:53amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8100-8102)
12/08/2010-10:53amHouseMr. Pomeroy moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/28/2010-11:19pmHouseHeld at the desk.
09/28/2010SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/28/2010-9:42pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/28/2010SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7655)
09/28/2010SenateSenate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7655)
09/15/2010SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 09/15/2010
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 09/15/2010
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 09/15/2010
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 09/15/2010
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 09/28/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Finance09/15/2010 Referred to
09/28/2010 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.3789. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-318 (12/18/2010)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Social Security Number Protection Act of 2010 - Prohibits federal, state, or local agencies from: (1) displaying the Social Security account number of any individual, or any derivative of such number, on any check issued for any payment by the agency; or (2) employing, or entering into a contract for the use or employment of, prisoners in any capacity that would allow them access to the Social Security account numbers of other individuals.