Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 09/20/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 09/20/2010
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 09/20/2010
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 09/20/2010
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 09/20/2010
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA]* 09/20/2010
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 09/20/2010
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 09/20/2010
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 09/20/2010
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 09/20/2010
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 09/21/2010
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 09/21/2010
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 09/21/2010
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/23/2010
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 09/27/2010
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 09/29/2010
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 11/15/2010
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 11/18/2010
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 12/16/2010