Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 09/21/2010
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 09/21/2010
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 09/21/2010
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 09/21/2010
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 09/21/2010
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 09/21/2010
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 09/21/2010
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 09/21/2010
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 09/21/2010
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 09/21/2010
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 09/21/2010
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 09/21/2010
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 09/21/2010
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 09/21/2010
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 09/21/2010
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL]* 09/21/2010
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE]* 09/21/2010
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 09/21/2010
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 09/21/2010
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 09/21/2010
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 09/22/2010
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/22/2010
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/22/2010
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 09/27/2010
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 09/27/2010
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 09/27/2010
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 09/28/2010
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/28/2010
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/29/2010
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/29/2010
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/29/2010
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/29/2010
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 11/17/2010
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 11/17/2010