Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 02/05/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 02/05/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/23/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/23/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/02/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 04/24/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/19/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 06/17/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/16/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/28/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/08/2009
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 10/28/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 03/01/2010
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/04/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/28/2010
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/15/2010