Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA]* 09/28/2010
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 09/28/2010
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 09/28/2010
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 09/28/2010
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/29/2010
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 09/29/2010
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 09/29/2010
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 11/15/2010
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 11/18/2010
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 11/18/2010
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 11/18/2010
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 12/08/2010