There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Reduction of Lead in Drinking Water Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Reduction of Lead in Drinking Water Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Reduction of Lead in Drinking Water Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Reduction of Lead in Drinking Water Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Reduction of Lead in Drinking Water Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Safe Drinking Water Act to reduce lead in drinking water.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
01/04/2011Became Public Law No: 111-380. (TXT | PDF)
01/04/2011Signed by President.
12/28/2010Presented to President.
12/17/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 226 - 109 (Roll no. 656).(text: CR H8617)
12/16/2010Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10364; text as passed Senate: CR S10364)
12/16/2010Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Boxer without amendment. Without written report.
09/29/2010Introduced in Senate

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
01/04/2011Became Public Law No: 111-380. (TXT | PDF)
01/04/2011Signed by President.
12/28/2010SenatePresented to President.
12/17/2010-5:04pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/17/2010-5:04pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 226 - 109 (Roll no. 656). (text: CR H8617)
12/17/2010-4:53pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: H8768-8769)
12/17/2010-10:52amHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/17/2010-10:27amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3874.
12/17/2010-10:27amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8617-8619)
12/17/2010-10:27amHouseMr. Doyle moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/17/2010SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/17/2010-9:41amHouseReceived in the House.
12/16/2010SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S10364; text as passed Senate: CR S10364)
12/16/2010SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 702.
12/16/2010SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Boxer without amendment. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on Environment and Public Works
11/30/2010SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on Environment and Public Works
09/29/2010SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Environment and Public Works09/29/2010 Referred to
11/30/2010 Markup by
12/16/2010 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.3874. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-380 (01/04/2011)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on December 16, 2010. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Reduction of Lead in Drinking Water Act - Amends the Safe Drinking Water Act to exempt from prohibitions on the use or sale of lead pipes, solder, and flux: (1) pipes or pipe or plumbing fittings or fixtures, including backflow preventers, that are used exclusively for nonpotable services such as manufacturing, industrial processing, irrigation, outdoor watering or any other uses where the water is not anticipated to be used for human consumption; or (2) toilets, bidets, urinals, fill valves, flushometer valves, tub fillers, shower valves, service saddles, or water distribution main gate valves that are two inches in diameter or larger.

Redefines "lead free" under such Act to mean: (1) not containing more than 0.2% lead when used with respect to solder and flux (current law); and (2) not more than a weighted average of 0.25% lead when used with respect to the wetted surfaces of pipes and pipe and plumbing fittings and fixtures. Establishes a formula to calculate the weighted average lead content of a pipe or pipe or plumbing fitting or fixture.

Makes this Act effective 36 months after its enactment.