Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 02/05/2009
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 02/05/2009
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 02/05/2009
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 02/05/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 02/05/2009
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 02/05/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 02/05/2009
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 02/05/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 02/05/2009
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 02/05/2009
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 02/05/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 02/05/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 02/05/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 02/05/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 02/05/2009
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 02/05/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 02/05/2009
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 02/05/2009
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 02/05/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 02/06/2009
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 02/06/2009
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/10/2009
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 02/10/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 02/10/2009
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 02/23/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 02/23/2009
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 02/23/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 02/25/2009
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 03/02/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 03/04/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/04/2009
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 03/09/2009
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 03/11/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 03/16/2009
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 03/30/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 06/11/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 08/03/2009