Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 09/29/2010
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 11/15/2010
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 11/15/2010
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 11/15/2010
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 11/15/2010
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 11/15/2010
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 11/15/2010
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 11/17/2010
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 11/17/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 11/17/2010
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 11/17/2010
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 11/17/2010
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 11/18/2010
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 11/18/2010
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 11/29/2010
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 11/29/2010
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 12/02/2010
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 12/02/2010
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 12/09/2010
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 12/09/2010