There is one summary. Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/29/2010)

Implementation of National Consensus Appliance Agreements Act - Amends the Energy Policy and Conservation Act (EPCA) to set forth provisions concerning establishing standards for: (1) a minimum level of energy efficiency or a maximum quantity of water use for clothes washers and dishwashers; (2) the seasonal energy efficiency ratio of central air conditioners and central air conditioning heat pumps manufactured on or after January 1, 2015; (3) the annual fuel utilization efficiency of non-weatherized furnaces manufactured on or after May 1, 2013; (4) energy efficiency of portable light fixtures manufactured on or after January 1, 2012, GU-24 Base Lamps, pole-mounted outdoor luminaires, high light output double-ended quartz halogen lamps, general service fluorescent lamps, general service incandescent lamps, intermediate base incandescent lamps, candelabra base incandescent lamps, and incandescent reflector lamps; (5) energy efficiency of bottle-type water dispensers and compartment bottle-type water dispensers, commercial hot food holding cabinets, and portable electric spas; (6) energy conservation of refrigerators and freezers manufactured on or after January 1, 2014; (7) minimum energy efficiency ratios of room air conditioners manufactured on or after June 1, 2014; (8) minimum energy efficiency of clothes dryers manufactured on or after January 1, 2015; (9) energy conservation of certain incandescent reflector lamps; (10) energy efficiency of warm air furnaces with an input rating of 225,000 Btu per hour or more and manufactured after January 1, 2011; (11) daily energy consumption of service over the counter, self-contained, medium temperature commercial refrigerators; and (12) nominal full load efficiency of specified electric motors.

Requires the Secretary of Energy (DOE) to publish rules that determine whether the Secretary should: (1) establish standards for through-the-wall central air conditioners, through-the-wall central air conditioning heat pumps, and small duct, high velocity systems; (2) amend standards for weatherized furnaces; and (3) initiate a process for establishing minimum energy efficiency standards for video game console energy use.

Amends the Energy Conservation Program for Consumer Products Other Than Automobiles to: (1) revise exceptions from preemption requirements for certain building code requirements; (2) provide that No-Load Mode energy efficiency standards do not apply to specified external power supplies manufactured before July 1, 2017; and (3) revise labeling rules for "covered products."

Prohibits the manufacture of general purpose mercury vapor lamps on or after January 1, 2016. Provides that state energy conservation standards that are adopted by January 1, 2015, pursuant to statutory requirements to adopt efficiency standards for reducing outdoor lighting energy use enacted prior to January 31, 2008, will not be preempted by federal standards. Provides that California and Nevada are not precluded from adopting, effective beginning on or after January 1, 2018, standards for general service lamps.

Authorizes the Secretary to incorporate smart grid technologies or capabilities into energy conservation standards.

Requires states to give notice to the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) about a state or local public comment period with respect to local laws prohibiting, limiting, or restricting the use of alternative refrigerants for specific end uses.

Requires the Administrator to determine whether to update the Energy Star criteria for residential refrigerators, refrigerator-freezers, freezers, dishwashers, clothes washers, clothes dryers, and room air conditioners to incorporate smart grid and demand response features.

Requires the Secretary to establish a program concerning increasing awareness of higher efficiency electric motors.