There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2009

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2009

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2009

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2009

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Amended by Senate

A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to provide for an increase, effective December 1, 2009, in the rates of compensation for veterans with service-connected disabilities and the rates of dependency and indemnity compensation for the survivors of certain disabled veterans, to codify increases in the rates of such compensation that were effective as of December 1, 2008, and for other purposes.

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to increase, effective as of December 1, 2009, the rates of compensation for veterans with service-connected disabilities and the rates of dependency and indemnity compensation for the survivors of certain disabled veterans, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
06/30/2009Became Public Law No: 111-37. (TXT | PDF)
06/30/2009Signed by President.
06/25/2009Presented to President.
06/23/2009Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 403 - 0 (Roll no. 419).(text: CR H7091-7092)
06/10/2009Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6476-6477; text as passed Senate: CR S6476-6477)
06/04/2009Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Akaka with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 111-24.
02/10/2009Introduced in Senate

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber
06/30/2009Became Public Law No: 111-37. (TXT | PDF)
06/30/2009Signed by President.
06/25/2009SenatePresented to President.
06/23/2009-6:57pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/23/2009-6:57pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 403 - 0 (Roll no. 419). (text: CR H7091-7092)
06/23/2009-6:32pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7108-7109)
06/23/2009-12:17pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
06/23/2009-12:11pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 407.
06/23/2009-12:11pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7091-7093)
06/23/2009-12:10pmHouseMr. Filner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
06/11/2009-5:32pmHouseHeld at the desk.
06/11/2009SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/11/2009-3:35pmHouseReceived in the House.
06/10/2009SenatePassed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6476-6477; text as passed Senate: CR S6476-6477)
06/04/2009SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 70.
06/04/2009SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Akaka with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 111-24.
05/21/2009SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
04/29/2009SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
02/10/2009SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
02/10/2009SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S2083)

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Veterans' Affairs02/10/2009 Referred to
04/29/2009 Hearings by
05/21/2009 Markup by
06/04/2009 Reported by S. Rept. 111-24

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.407. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-37 (06/30/2009)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on June 10, 2009. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2009 - Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (VA) to increase, as of December 1, 2009, the rates of veterans' disability compensation, additional compensation for dependents, the clothing allowance for certain disabled veterans, and dependency and indemnity compensation for surviving spouses and children.

Requires each such increase to be the same percentage as the increase in benefits provided under title II (Old Age, Survivors and Disability Insurance) of the Social Security Act, on the same effective date.

Codifies under federal law the rates of such compensation as increased under the Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2008.