Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 02/11/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 02/11/2009
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 02/11/2009
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 02/11/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/11/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 02/11/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 02/11/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 02/11/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 02/11/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 02/11/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 02/11/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 02/11/2009
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 02/11/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 02/11/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 02/11/2009
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 02/23/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 02/25/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/26/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 03/30/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 04/27/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 04/27/2009