Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 01/06/2009
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 01/06/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 01/06/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 01/06/2009
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 01/06/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 01/06/2009
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 01/07/2009
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 01/09/2009
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/30/2009
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 07/10/2009