Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 02/12/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 02/12/2009
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 02/12/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 02/12/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 02/12/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 02/12/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 02/12/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 02/12/2009
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 02/12/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 02/12/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 02/12/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 02/12/2009
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 02/12/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 02/12/2009
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 02/12/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 02/12/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/12/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 02/12/2009
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 02/25/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 03/03/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/09/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/09/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 03/09/2009
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 03/10/2009
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 03/11/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/11/2009
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 03/17/2009
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 03/18/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 03/19/2009
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 03/30/2009
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 03/30/2009
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/02/2009
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 04/20/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 04/20/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/20/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/22/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/22/2009
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 04/22/2009
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 04/27/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 04/28/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/28/2009
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 04/29/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/29/2009
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/04/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 05/06/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/20/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 05/20/2009
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 05/21/2009
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/10/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/15/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/24/2009
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 07/06/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 07/06/2009
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 07/30/2009
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 07/31/2009
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 08/03/2009