Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 02/12/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 02/12/2009
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 02/13/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/16/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/01/2009
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 04/01/2009
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 04/20/2009
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 04/27/2009