Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 02/12/2009
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 02/12/2009
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 02/12/2009
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 02/23/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 02/25/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/26/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/02/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/02/2009
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 03/02/2009
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 03/03/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/06/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/06/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/10/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/10/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/12/2009
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 03/12/2009
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 03/17/2009
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 03/30/2009
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/30/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/30/2009
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 04/21/2009
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 04/21/2009
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 04/29/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 04/29/2009
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR] 04/30/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/11/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/21/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/21/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 07/13/2009
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/21/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 08/05/2009
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 09/14/2009
Sen. Hagan, Kay R. [D-NC] 11/04/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 12/08/2009
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 12/14/2009
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 01/20/2010
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 02/01/2010
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/01/2010
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/10/2010

Show cosponsors who withdrew