Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 02/12/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 02/13/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 04/27/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 04/27/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 07/22/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 08/06/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 09/08/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 09/08/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/08/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 09/29/2010