Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 02/13/2009
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/09/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/17/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 03/31/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 03/31/2009
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 04/20/2009
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 06/18/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 06/18/2009
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 07/06/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 08/07/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 09/30/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 12/02/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/13/2010
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 04/27/2010
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/24/2010
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 09/27/2010